DE SB74 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act relates to the police and fire pension fund provisions of Chapter 7, Title 18 of the Delaware Code. The Act clarifies that an eligible retiree must be alive on July 1 of each biennial payout year in order to receive the payment provided for in Section 708 of Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2021-03-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-18 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-02-26 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback