DE SB65 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Joint Sunset Committee recommended in 2014 that the Board of Funeral Services (the Board) and the Division of Professional Regulation (the Division) review Chapter 24, Title 31 of the Delaware Code and submit in 2015 proposed legislation to bring the law up to date with current funeral services standards and practices. This Act is the result of the Board and Division’s review and submission. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual. Author: Sen. Poore
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Funeral Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 Favorable |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |