DE SB49 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - SS 1 for SB 49 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - SS 1 for SB 49 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill enables the use of rooftop solar systems on privately owned residential dwellings by limiting the use of covenants or other restrictions beginning January 1, 2010 but does not impact restrictions in effect prior to then . This bill also permits any deed restrictions which are silent as to how they may be amended may hereafter be amended by a vote of no more than 75% of the property owners. Restrictions concerning solar collectors on roofs may be amended by two-thirds of the property owners.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Solar Photovoltaic Systems And Amendments To Deed Restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | SS 1 for SB 49 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | SS 1 for SB 49 - Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-16 | SS 1 for SB 49 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-16 | SS 1 for SB 49 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-16 | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 49 | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2009-04-07 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |