DE SB43 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a substitute for Senate Bill No. 43. Both this Act and SB 43 add additional State facilities and categories of establishments to § 787 of Title 11 which would be required to display public awareness signs about human trafficking. The additional State facilities and categories are as follows:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Display Of Human Trafficking Public Awareness Signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-08 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2023-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-01 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 43, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |