DE SB41 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the Town of Georgetown to more closely align with State municipal election requirements. This Act also adjusts the timing for the filing of Statements of Candidacy to be reflective of and in alignment with other timelines. This Act modernizes notice requirements to utilize the Town website, which will provide broader notice to the public. This Act also amends the procedure for handling an election resulting in a tie vote; a tie vote will be resolved by special election, rather than a decision by the Board of Elections, to promote a democratic resolution.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Georgetown Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-03-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-03-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-17 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-03-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |