DE SB35 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-26 - SS 1 for SB 35 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-26 - SS 1 for SB 35 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill imposes dollar limits on the prescription drug insurance practice of cost-sharing known as specialty tiers in order to protect patients from unaffordable co-insurance or co-payment fees. Patient’s co-insurance or co-payment fees for specialty tier drugs will be limited to $100 per month for up to a 30-day supply of any single specialty tier drug; and will not exceed, in the aggregate for all specialty tier covered drugs, $200 per month per enrollee. The bill goes into effect on January 1, 2014.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Specialty Tier Prescription Drug Coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Robert Venables [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Restored in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-06-06 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-06 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 35 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 35 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |