DE SB30 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
This Act amends the Fiscal Year 2021 Bond and Capital Improvements Act to (1) authorize a portion of funding previously allocated to the Kalmar Nyckel Foundation to be used for unrestricted operations; (2) authorize additional reimbursements from the Community Transportation Fund; (3) authorize the Secretary of State to rapidly complete restoration and maintenance projects and sell, transfer or acquire historic buildings and sites; (4) authorize New Castle County Vocational Technical School District to transfer non-obligated funds from Howard High School/1927 Building to St. Georges Technical High School and Delcastle Technical High School; (5) authorize funding previously allocated to the Peoples Settlement Association to be used for additional repairs; (6) authorize funding from the Transportation Infrastructure Investment Fund to be used for improvements at the Daniel S. Frawley Stadium; (7) authorize prior year contingency funding to ensure timely completion of a system for the Registrar of Regulations; (8) authorize the Department of Transportation to transfer funding for storm related repairs; (9) authorize the Department of Transportation to use Community Transportation Funds to maintain roads in the Knollac Acres community; and (10) authorize prior year contingency funding for the Rose Hill Community Center renovations project.
Title
An Act To Amend The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-01-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-01-28 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-01-22 | Assigned to Capital Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2021-01-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-01-21 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2021-01-21 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2021-01-20 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |