DE SB3 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act would require the Diamond State Port Corporation to obtain the approval of a majority of both Houses of the General Assembly and the Governor, through the passage of legislation, before entering into any agreement or transaction whereby the Corporation would transfer, sell, privatize, or lease all or substantially all of the Port of Wilmington to a single entity, or to a related group of entities.
Title
Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Government And The Diamond State Port Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 6 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Laid On Table in Senate |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |