DE SB255 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Summary
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |