DE SB238 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation will require manufactured home community owners to provide prospective tenants with a copy of the proposed rental agreement, a copy of the rules, standards and fee schedule of the manufactured home community, a copy of the Manufactured Home Owners and Community Owners Act, and a summary of the Act written by the Attorney General at the time the prospective tenant obtains an application for tenancy in the community, to ensure that prospective tenants have ample time and opportunity to review the documents prior to entering the community.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Homes And Manufactured Home Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 5 Favorable |
2014-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |