DE SB232 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this Bill is to ensure that when a professional licensing board revokes or suspends a license at a hearing, the revocation or suspension shall be effective immediately. However, the Bill also requires that a written order must be served within 30 days after the hearing date.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Civil Administrative Procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |