DE SB231 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act serves to codify numerous policies that promote the autonomy of the Alderman’s Court and thereby foster public confidence in the Court. The Act describes the processes of nomination, appointment by the Governor and confirmation by the Senate. Pursuant to this Act, many of the policies applicable to the Magistrate’s Court are applied to Alderman’s Court, such as requirements to segregate the Court from the Town’s offices. It also codifies standards relating to vacancies, qualifications, duties and jurisdiction.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 288, Volume 64, Laws Of The State Of Delaware, The Charter Of The Town Of Laurel Relating To The Alderman And Assistant Alderman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |