DE SB218 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This change would make court costs for traffic offenses involving civil penalties governed by Justice of the Peace Court rule, consistent with the change to 9801 of title 10 that took effect earlier in the 145th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Court Costs For Civil Traffic Offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-15 Signed by Governor
2010-06-08 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-05-05 Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2010-04-27 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2010-04-22 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-03-31 Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2010-03-23 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback