DE SB214 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill provides two exemptions from the use of cutoff luminaires on DelDOT lighting systems. The first is for lighting of interstates, expressways, freeways and interchanges where by the nature of the roadways and widths, proper illuminance is more difficult and expensive to achieve because significantly greater numbers of poles and fixtures can be required. The second is for maintenance of existing facilities, such as repairing or replacement of a fixture within a series of lights. Replacing these existing fixtures with a cutoff fixture requires a full design re-evaluation and possible reconstruction of the system (including installation of additional fixtures) in order to maintain recommended luminance, because the lighting characteristics of cut-off luminaries/fixtures is different from other devices. Passage of this Bill will result in reduction of costs associated with new design of these types of facilities where complying with the law creates the need for many additional fixtures which is both an increase in capital and operations dollars.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Outdoor Lighting Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2010-04-27 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |