DE SB189 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the Limited License for Dentists to an Academic License and sets forth the requirements. These licensees work as directors, chairs or faculty of hospitals.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Academic Licensing For Dentistry.
Sponsors
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Rebecca Walker [D] | Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-13 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |