DE SB185 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act extends the date that the requirements created by Senate Bill 283 in the 151st become effective to allow the Division of Professional Regulation more time to implement these requirements.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Continuing Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2023-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-23 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2023-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 185 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 185 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |