DE SB180 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides procedures to ensure that each child with a disability who has reached age 18 has an identified educational decision-maker to exercise rights under this chapter. A child with a disability who has capacity may exercise his own rights or appoint an agent to exercise educational rights. A child with a disability who does not have capacity to provide informed consent with respect to educational programming will have an educational representative appointed, with a parent receiving priority for that role. The Department of Education, with the approval of the State Board of Education, shall promulgate regulations to implement this section. The Act shall be in effect 180 days from the date of enactment to allow regulations to be developed and provide school districts and charter schools time to receive training.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Authorizing The Department Of Education To Establish And Maintain Procedures For The Appointment Of Individuals To Represent The Educational Interests Of A Child With A Disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |