DE SB179 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act replaces references to Masters in the Court of Chancery with Magistrate.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 8, Title 10, Title 12, And Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Changes To The Title Master In Chancery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2023-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2023-06-23 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |