DE SB179 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill prohibits housing discrimination based on source of income by adding “source of income” as a protected class under the Delaware Fair Housing Act and the Landlord Tenant Code. A person may still take into account sufficiency of income and credit worthiness of a tenant or buyer, so long as any standards are applied neutrally without regard to the source of income. There is also an exception for landlords who are employees of a housing authority and are prohibited by their employer’s conflict of interest policy from renting to persons receiving housing assistance payments. The bill contains language specifying that landlords will not be compelled to participate in rental assistance programs, and that the bill is not meant to prevent landlords who do participate in housing programs from reserving a certain number of units for that purpose. This measure will prevent and address discrimination against those who receive part or all of their income from child support, government or private assistance programs, or any lawful occupation.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6 And 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Fair Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 21 YES 15 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 3 Unfavorable |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |