DE SB168 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Veterinary Medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2023-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-16 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2023-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |