DE SB160 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-19)
Status: Passed on January 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-19)
Status: Passed on January 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Uniformed Controlled Substances Act by clarifying that the definition of “designer drugs” covers those synthetic analogues of controlled substances that are made and distributed for drug use but due to their novelty have not yet been added to the schedule of controlled substances. This amendment to Delaware’s drug code will ensure there are no gaps in the law’s coverage of these dangerous substances as they surface. One such recent example is “bath salts.” This Act bans the possession, use, sale, or delivery of synthetic cathinones, more commonly known as “bath salts,” by categorizing synthetic cathinones as a Schedule I controlled substance under 16 Del. C. 4714(f). This Act also removes “synthetic cannabanoids” from the definition section of the Uniform Controlled Substances Act and categorizes the chemical compounds within the Schedule I controlled substance under 16 Del. C. 4714(d). Finally, this Act creates Tier Quantities for Schedule I controlled substances, such as “bath salts,” not otherwise included in 16 Del. C. 4751C.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-01-19 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2012-01-12 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-01-11 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-01-07 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |