DE SB145 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the Municipal Service Commission of the City of New Castle by granting the City Council of New Castle the power to appoint two of the three Commissioners to serve on the Municipal Service Commission, with the incumbent Mayor as the third Commissioner. This Act also sets the terms of each appointed Commissioner to 4 years, and allows the City Administrator to serve as a substitute for the Mayor on the Commission in the Mayor's absence.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Municipal Service Commission Of The City Of New Castle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-16 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-05-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |