DE SB133 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Boys And Girls Club of Delaware, Inc. to convey the Richard Allen School property to the Richard Allen Coalition Inc. The deed of the property will continue to include a reversion to the Indian River School District.
Title
An Act To Amend The Laws Of Delaware To Allow The Boys And Girls Club Of Delaware, Inc. To Convey The Richard Allen School Property To The Richard Allen Coalition Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2015-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |