DE SB114 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill updates existing laws under Title 16 by making corrections to terms used concerning the State Spay and Neuter Program, and members assigned to the Spay and Neuter Performance Review Committee, including the addition of a representative of a non-profit animal shelter who has been established in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Animal Population Control Program And Shelter Standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Signed by Governor
2018-03-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-15 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Amendment HA 2 to SB 114 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-15 Amendment HA 1 to SB 114 - Stricken in House
2018-03-15 Amendment HA 1 to SB 114 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-14 Amendment HA 2 to SB 114 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-06-28 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback