DE SB113 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This bill authorizes the creation of a Delaware Voluntary Property Assessed Clean Energy (D-PACE) program to establish a clean energy financing program for the installation of energy efficiency technologies and clean energy systems for qualifying commercial real properties statewide. PACE programs are authorized in more than 30 states nationwide. The financing will be secured by and payable from a voluntary assessment imposed on the property benefited by the qualifying energy improvement. The bill calls upon the Sustainable Energy Utility (SEU) to administer the program and establish a statewide financing program to aid counties in expanding clean energy projects in their jurisdictions. Projects under D-PACE can be financed through the SEU or other participating financial institutions.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Delaware Voluntary Clean Energy Financing Program Through Local Government Assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 9 NO | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2018-06-06 | Assigned to Energy Committee in House | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 7 to SB 113 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 11 NO | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 4 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 4 to SB 113 - Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 5 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 4 to SB 113 - Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 3 to SB 113 - Stricken in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-05 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO | |
2018-04-26 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-04-26 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-01-25 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-01-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-01-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-01-25 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-01-24 | Amendment SA 3 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-01-24 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-01-23 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-01-23 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-01-23 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Roll Call Rescinded in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Reconsidered in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-15 | Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 6 NO 3 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-09 | ReAssigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |