DE HJR4 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Resolution directs the Criminal Justice Council to establish and by November 2, 2021, publish integrity reports on the number of complaints made against police officers in each police agency in this State for the past 3 years, and at least once a year thereafter, and to create and publish a list of all decertified police officers in this State in the previous 10 years, which shall be updated upon notification of the decertification of any police officer.
Title
Directing The Criminal Justice Council To Establish And Publish Integrity Reports Concerning Complaints Made Against Police Officers In Each Police Agency In This State And To Create And Publish A List Of Decertified Police Officers In This State.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Franklin Cooke [D] |
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-22 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |