DE HCR63 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This resolution extends the due date of the findings and recommendations report of the Delaware Anti-Dumping and Anti-Littering Solutions Task Force from April 1, 2018 to September 30, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending The Reporting Date Of The Delaware Anti-dumping And Anti-littering Solutions Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-03-13 Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-13 Introduced in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback