DE HCR31 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This House concurrent resolution urges Congress to require the United States Department of Defense to designate “Prisoner of War” and “Missing in Action” into the casualty status and category classification for military service.
Title
Urging Congress To Require The United States Department Of Defense To Designate "prisoner Of War" And "missing In Action" Into The Casualty Status And Category Classification For Military Personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. John Atkins [D] | Sen. George Bunting [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. George [?] |
Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House |