DE HB92 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
House Bill No. 92 reduces the term of a member elected to a school board from 5 years to 4 years for members elected after December 31, 2021.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Term Of School Board Members.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Rep. Kendra Johnson [D] | Rep. Larry Lambert [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 9 NO | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-10 | Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 18 NO | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-04 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 92, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |