DE HB80 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act replaces existing Chapter 83 of the Delaware Insurance Code and sets forth the permissible uses of credit information in rating personal insurance. This Act also prohibits insurance companies from increasing rates on current customers solely for having reached the age of 75 or above or for having a change in marital status due to the death of a spouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-01 Signed by Governor
2017-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-15 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-06-15 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-06-06 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 80, and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback