DE HB78 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill extends the amount of years an identification card is valid from four (4) to eight (8) years. This bill is necessary for the Division of Motor Vehicles to maintain consistent business processes. The driver license is currently valid for eight (8) years, and this change would maintain consistency with the driver license requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nondriver Identification Cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2021-01-28 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2021-01-27 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-01-19 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback