DE HB48 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill fixes a drafting error in Senate Bill 198 of the 148th General Assembly that inadvertently made it harder for juveniles to get mandatory expungements by adding the term violent misdemeanor as an excepting factor that would prevent a youth from receiving an expungement. Previously, violent misdemeanors were never included in the states statute regarding mandatory expungements. The bill also strikes the definition of violent misdemeanor, which is no longer applicable to the states juvenile expungement statute.The phrase sex offense was added after the word felony for clarity and to mirror the definition in ยง 1016. No substantive change is made by this clarification.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Juvenile Expungements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-04-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-21 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-03-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2017-01-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |