DE HB439 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill authorizes the Thoroughbred Racing Commission to be a member of the new Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact. Under the Bill the Thoroughbred Racing Commission would become a member of an interstate Compact with other party states for the establishment of uniform standards for drug testing of horses participating in horse racing. The Harness Racing Commission will not be a member of the Compact. The purpose of the Compact is to establish uniform requirements among the party states for the drug testing of horses participating in horse racing. The Compact Committee would be comprised of one representative from each party state.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Horse Racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |