DE HB435 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 435 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 435 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prevents unreasonable deductibles, copayments, or coinsurance charges for chiropractic care. Some managed care providers have arbitrarily classified chiropractors as “specialists” in order to charge copayments and deductibles that are in excess of those charged for primary care medical doctors. This Act establishes that the maximum amount of any deductible, copayment, or coinsurance charge for chiropractic care shall be the lesser of either: (i) the deductible or copayment for a primary care physician, or (ii) 15% of the fee due to be paid to the chiropractic under the insurance policy for the treatment provider.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Chiropractic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 10 NO 4 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-24 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-16 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 for HB 435 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2010-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |