DE HB419 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows the Delaware Real Estate Commission to develop a new form of Seller’s Disclosure for the sale of vacant land being sold without a house, but being marketed as appropriate for the construction of a dwelling for 1-4 families.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Buyer Property Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |