DE HB417 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Legislation provides a mechanism for financial institutions to freeze transactions that they suspect are financial exploitation of an elderly person. It requires the financial institution to report the suspected financial exploitation to proper agencies. If DHSS discovers financial exploitation of an elderly person, the banks have clear authority to hold transactions upon receipt of that information. It also updates the definition of exploitation and creates a definition of financial exploitation for any adult who is impaired. It amends the existing immunity provision to provide immunity for holding transactions and eliminates very open ended immunity language that could be claimed as a safe harbor by the person who engaged in any abuse because they cooperate with the investigation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Adult Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 12 On Its Merits |
2014-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |