DE HB410 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Summary
A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2013; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds And Bond Premiums Of The State; Reverting And Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; Amending Certain Statutory Provisions; And Amending The Laws Of Delaware.
Title
A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2013; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds And Bond Premiums Of The State; Reverting And Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; Amending Certain Statutory Provisions; And Amending The Laws Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-30 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2012-06-26 | Introduced in House and assigned to Capital Infrastructure Committee | |
2012-06-26 | Assigned to Capital Infrastructure Committee in House |