DE HB372 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill expands line of duty death benefits to include individuals who die from a heart attack, stroke, or vascular rupture within 24 hours of on duty strenuous physical activity. This Bill further removes the statute of limitations on submitting a claim for benefits. The Act shall be applied retroactively to include all claims for benefits for a death occurring on or after July 1, 2005. This Act shall be known as the Delaware Hometown Heroes Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Line-of-duty Death Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |