DE HB37 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Delaware, like the rest of the country and the world, has been struggling with the COVID-19 pandemic since March of 2020. The worst outbreaks have occurred in facilities where people live and/or work in tight communal settings long-term care facilities, prisons, and meat processing plants. There is no real way to prevent an outbreak and the spread of a highly contagious disease inside a prison where inmates share cells, communal recreation and dining spaces, and in some instances reside in large bunk rooms. Furthermore, the COVID-19 pandemic has severely disrupted the operations of the prisons as they struggle with staff shortages due to illness and quarantines, and curtail activities to reduce opportunities for community spread within the prison.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Health Emergency Credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-03-31 Amendment HA 2 to HB 37 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-03-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 37 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-01-26 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-12-18 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback