DE HB351 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Delaware Aging and Disability Resource Center within the Division of Services for Aging and Adults with Physical Disabilities of the Department of Health and Social Services, replacing the current Elder Care Information and Support System for Delaware Families. The Aging and Disability Resource Center will provide support for the elderly and adults with physical disabilities by combining existing Alzheimer’s specific information into the program and supporting future Federal grant applications for Aging and Disability Resource Center projects.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Elder Care Information And Support System For Delaware Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-20 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |