DE HB312 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends Title 25, section 7006 to clarify the terms “standing water” and “stagnant water”.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Home Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-20 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 21 YES 14 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-01 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-31 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced in House and assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |