DE HB307 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In 2015, the Legislature enacted the one-time fee of no more than $100 for an educator’s first license in Delaware. This Bill provides a waiver for graduates of Delaware high schools and graduates of teacher preparatory programs located in Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Fees For Educator Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 11 On Its Merits |
2016-04-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |