DE HB301 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act repeals a provision in the State Employees Pension Plan that included participants in the Division for the Visually Impaireds (DVI) Business Enterprise Program (BEP) in the State pension plan. BEP participants are meant to be independent blind entrepreneurs operating their own vending facilities in federal and state properties, as authorized by the Randolph-Sheppard Act (20 U.S.C. ยง 107 et seq.).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees' Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2020-06-16 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2020-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2020-06-04 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2020-03-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |