DE HB300 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Substitute Bill requires the Department of Health and Social Services to maintain a public registry of assisted living facilities that are accredited and/or certified to provide memory care services by an approved independent accrediting organization.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Long-term Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 300 |