DE HB290 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act gives the Family Court discretion in sentencing a child for an act of delinquency to waive or suspend any required fines, court costs or penalty assessments.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Proceedings In The Interest Of A Child And Adjudications Of Delinquency.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 Favorable |
2014-04-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |