DE HB277 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act extends the sunset provision contained within Volume 78, Chapter 349, of the Delaware Laws by two years, to June 30, 2016. Volume 79, Chapter 349 of the Delaware Laws provided the State the same statutory transfer rights afforded defendants charged with Driving Under the Influence (“DUI”). This single track for the disposition of DUI offenses provides a mechanism for the development and implementation of specialized (treatment focused) sentencing and subsequent intensive Court supervision (probation) of DUI offenders. This Act extends the window to allow stakeholders to continue efforts in developing a specialized disposition framework – often referred to as a “DUI Court.”
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 349, Volume 78 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Driving A Vehicle While Under The Influence.
Sponsors
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Sen. Robert Venables [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |