DE HB267 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 267 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 267 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases various fees and taxes assessed by the Delaware Secretary of State. The Act provides for an effective date as of January 1, 2009 for all tax changes and an effective date of August 1, 2009 for all other changes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6, Title 8, Title 12, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Various Fees And Taxes Charged By The Secretary Of State.
Sponsors
Sen. Thurman Adams [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 28 YES 13 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Lifted From Table in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 6 - Ruled Out of Order in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 6 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 5 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-30 | Amendment HA 5 defeated | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 4 - Stricken | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 5 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 4 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 3 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 1 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Lifted From Table in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Lifted From Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 267 - Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-25 | Amendment HA 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 4 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |