DE HB263 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is an attempt to ensure that every public school in the State of Delaware has a nurse. This bill provides a mechanism to allow public schools that currently do not have a school nurse to receive state funds. The bill also allows for a match tax to assist those school districts that acquire a nurse as a result of this bill to pay for the local share of that nurse.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |