DE HB259 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill removes the sunset provision from the public education unit count law adopted in the first session of the 146th General Assembly. The provision, previously set to expire April 1, 2012, was extended two years by legislation in the second session of the 146th General Assembly. Removing the provision allows the law to continue permanently beyond April 1, 2014.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 7, Volume 78, Laws Of Delaware Relating To Public Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 9 Favorable |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |