DE HB255 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds violations of a county or municipal code to the list of offenses that are eligible for probation before judgment. County and municipal code violations are similar in nature to the types of offenses that were previously eligible for probation before judgment and are appropriate for this type of sentencing option if all of the listed requirements are met. Probation before judgment would only be allowable where the person has not violated another county or municipal code provision in five years prior to the offense for which probation before judgment is sought. Any offense for which probation before judgment is not permissible in the Delaware Code shall not be subject to probation before judgment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Probation Before Judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |